Lipp, Trent Douglas (CPSO#: 101969)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 12 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Queensland, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Aug 2013 to 03 Nov 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Nov 2013 to 12 Mar 2014
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Mar 2014