Lipson, Jennifer Erin (CPSO#: 84588)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 209
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 680-9092
Fax: (613) 680-9093
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Lipson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lipson ( CPSO# 84588 )

Business Address:
Suite 209
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER ERIN LIPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIPSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012