Lipton, Irving Henry (CPSO#: 18799)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Oct 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Sep 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1999