Lipton, Jeffrey Howard (CPSO#: 58746)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jan 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Calgary, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Department Of Medicine
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2266
Fax: (416) 946-6585
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ellen Warner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 21 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Warner ( CPSO# 52213 )
Dr. J. Lipton ( CPSO# 58746 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4617

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 07 Sep 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY HOWARD LIPTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIPTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1988