Liserani, Princess Donna Marie (CPSO#: 62700)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: Michaud, Princess Donna Marie (used until: 12 Jun 1990 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001