Lisi, Michael Patrick (CPSO#: 79294)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Shipyards Medical Arts Centre
Suite 200
28 Huron Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1C4
Phone: (705) 444-0089
Fax: (705) 444-0019
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lisi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 7 2016


Corporation Name: Lisi and Akinyele Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Akinyele ( CPSO# 69780 )
Dr. M. Lisi ( CPSO# 79294 )

Business Address:
The Shipyards Medical Arts Centre
Suite 300
28 Huron Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1C4
Phone Number: (705) 444-0089


Corporation Name: Lisi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lisi ( CPSO# 79294 )

Business Address:
The Shipyards Medical Arts Centre
Suite 300
28 Huron Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1C4
Phone Number: (705) 444-0089

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL PATRICK LISI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LISI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008