Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Lisinski, Julian Tadeusz (CPSO#: 57711)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Oct 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of London, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hillside Medical Centre
541 Third Avenue
PO Box 700
Ladysmith BC  V9G 1A5
Phone: (250) 245-7551
Fax: (250) 245-3094

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIAN TADEUSZ LISINSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LISINSKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jul 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2007