Liske, Sabine Irene (CPSO#: 63835)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 375
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: (905) 337-1995
Fax: (905) 337-1994
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Liske Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Liske ( CPSO# 63835 )

Business Address:
Palermo Professional Centre
Unit 375
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (905) 337-1995

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SABINE IRENE LISKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LISKE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1992