List, Stephen Joel (CPSO#: 55345)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Program for Schizophrenia
20 Hughson Street South
Suite 405
Hamilton ON  L8N 2A1
Phone: (905) 525-2832
Fax: (905) 546-0055
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN JOEL LIST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIST is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1988