Lister, Alan John (CPSO#: 29771)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Jun 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jun 1995