Lister, John Godfrey (CPSO#: 15247)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 09 Feb 1987

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1955
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 09 Feb 1987

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Nov 1985
Summary:

 In November 1985, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Lister guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the records that 
 are required to be kept respecting his patients, contrary to s. 27(3); in that he failed to 
 maintain the standard of practice of the profession, contrary to s. 27(21); and in that he 
 committed sexual impropriety with a patient, contrary to s. 27(29).  Consequently, the Committee 
 ordered that Dr. Lister's licence to practice be revoked.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 09 Feb 1987
Hearing Date(s): 21 Nov 1985