Listgarten, Charles (CPSO#: 20555)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Sep 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Sep 1970

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Italian, Yiddish

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
57 Weeping Willow Lane
Thornhill ON  L3T3R9
Phone: (905) 707-1168
Fax: (905 707-1168
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES LISTGARTEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LISTGARTEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 1966
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 May 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 1970