Listoe, Gregory Bernard (CPSO#: 60883)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Sep 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10501 fgcu blvd s
fort myers FL  33965
United States
Phone: 2395907961
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Listoe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Listoe ( CPSO# 60883 )

Business Address:
532 Lake Street
Suite 101
St Catharines ON  L2N 4H4
Phone Number: (905) 646-0015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida
USA - Georgia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY BERNARD LISTOE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LISTOE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2002