Lit, Wilson Moses (CPSO#: 61391)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Phone: (519) 824-1010
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILSON MOSES LIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1990