Litchfield, Robert Bruce (CPSO#: 57162)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Dec 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fowler Kennedy Sport Medicine
University of Western Ontario
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone: (519) 661-4156
Fax: (519) 850-2497
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Litchfield Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Litchfield ( CPSO# 57162 )

Business Address:
Fowler Kennedy Sport Medicine Clinic
University of Western Ontario
3M Centre
1151 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone Number: (519) 661-4156

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT BRUCE LITCHFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LITCHFIELD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 1987