Lithwick, Norton Hertz (CPSO#: 21282)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 10 Mar 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 30 Oct 2007
Summary:

 On October 30, 2007, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Lithwick committed professional 
 misconduct in that he engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
 medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
 disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
 

The Committee ordered that Dr. Lithwick be 
 reprimanded and that the results of the proceedings be included in the College register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 30, 2007