Litsas, Steven (CPSO#: 71479)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woodbridge Medical Centre
9600 Islington Avenue
Unit A13
Woodbridge ON  L4H 2T1
Phone: (905) 893-8085
Fax: (905) 893-8218
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steve Litsas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Litsas ( CPSO# 71479 )

Business Address:
Woodbridge Medical Centre
A13 - 9600 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge ON  L4H 2T1
Phone Number: (905) 893-8085

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN LITSAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LITSAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999