Little, D'Arcy Lawrence (CPSO#: 69217)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Staff Radiologist
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201 Ext. 3077
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Consultant Radiologist
Canadian Vascular Laboratories
Suite 100
16700 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1
Canada
Phone: (905) 953-9044
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

York Ultrasound
219 Sheppard Avenue West
North York ON  M2N 1N2
Canada
Phone: (416) 913-4228
Fax: (416) 915-9009
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto East X-ray and Ultrasound
1145 Morningside Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1B 0A7
Canada
Phone: (647) 647-3500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

PACE Medical Imaging
Unit 21-23
117 Yonge Street
Alliston ON  L9R 1V2
Canada
Phone: (705) 434-0074
Fax: (705) 434-9074
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D'Arcy Little Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Little ( CPSO# 69217 )

Business Address:
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Business Address:
Canadian Vascular Laboratories
Suite 100
16700 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1
Phone Number: (905) 953-9044

Business Address:
York Ultrasound
219 Sheppard Avenue West
North York ON  M2N 1N2
Phone Number: (416) 913-4228

Business Address:
Toronto east X-Ray & Ultrasound
1145 Monringside Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1B 0A7
Phone Number: (647) 350-0401

Business Address:
PACE Medical Imaging
117 Young Street
Suite 21-23
Alliston ON  L9R 1V2
Phone Number: (705) 434-0074

Business Address:
Dufferin Medical Imaging Centre
2045 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6E 3R4
Phone Number: (416) 807-7411

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. D'ARCY LAWRENCE LITTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LITTLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Sep 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1999