Little, Janet Gail (CPSO#: 63847)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Mar 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 209
400 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 0H7
Phone: (905) 636-1888
Fax: (905) 636-1124
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Janet Little Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Little ( CPSO# 63847 )

Business Address:
209 - 400 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 0H7
Phone Number: (905) 636-1888

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANET GAIL LITTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LITTLE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1993