Little, Kyrie Anne (CPSO#: 62580)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
55 Wyndham Street
Guelph ON  N1H 7T8
Phone: (519) 837-2283
Fax: (519) 767-2262
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kyrie Little Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Little ( CPSO# 62580 )

Business Address:
Suite 208
55 Wyndham Street North
Guelph ON  N1H 7T8
Phone Number: (519) 837-2283

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KYRIE ANNE LITTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LITTLE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1992