Little, Sian Caroline Crawford (CPSO#: 50939)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Nov 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 402
114 Maitland Street
Toronto ON  M4Y 1E1
Phone: (416) 631-2686
Fax: (416) 924-9915
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 12 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIAN CAROLINE CRAWFORD LITTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LITTLE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Other - Rotating Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 12 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1985