Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Littleford, Judith Anne (CPSO#: 58799)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Second floor, Harry Medovy House
Health Sciences Centre
671 William Avenue
Winnipeg MB  R3E 0Z2
Phone: (204) 787-2261

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 02 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUDITH ANNE LITTLEFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LITTLEFORD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Aug 2010
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Oct 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1992