Litwin, Shlomo (CPSO#: 33134)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Mar 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Mar 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 406
1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone: (613) 725-2993
Fax: (613) 725-1138
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Litwin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Litwin ( CPSO# 33134 )

Business Address:
Suite 406
1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone Number: (613) 725-2993

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHLOMO LITWIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LITWIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 1982