Liu, Bin (CPSO#: 77014)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 May 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 May 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Nanjing Medical College, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 106
139 Greenbank Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 9A5
Phone: (613) 680-6821
Fax: (613) 680-7826
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 11 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BIN LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2001 to 30 Nov 2001
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 2003