Liu, Chen-Shin (CPSO#: 85927)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jan 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jan 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Adelaide, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2007 to 16 Mar 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 17 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jan 2008
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jan 2008