Liu, Chongen (CPSO#: 87033)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:West China Medical University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
2330 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1T 0A2
Phone: (416) 609-0000
Fax: (416) 609-0001
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chongen Liu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Liu ( CPSO# 87033 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
2330 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1T 0A2
Phone Number: (416) 609-0000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHONGEN LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2009