Liu, Fang (CPSO#: 89197)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Shanghai Medical University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010