Liu, Grace Yuin (CPSO#: 69216)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Aug 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite B627
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 5063
Fax: (416) 480-4317
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grace Y. Liu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Yu ( CPSO# 70191 )
Dr. G. Liu ( CPSO# 69216 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite B627
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5063

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRACE YUIN LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2000