Liu, Jerome Jonathan (CPSO#: 98406)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Black Creek Community Health Centre
Unit 5
2202 Jane Street
Toronto ON  M3M 1A4
Phone: (416) 249-8000
Fax: (416) 249-4594
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jerome Liu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Liu ( CPSO# 98406 )

Business Address:
Blackcreek Community Health Centre
2202 Jane Street
Unit 5
Toronto ON  M3M 1A4
Phone Number: (416) 249-8000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEROME JONATHAN LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Oct 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2014