Liu, Jiang (CPSO#: 76909)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Shanghai Second Medical College, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Oct 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003