Liu, Kimberly Ellen (CPSO#: 80612)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Fertility
Suite 700
250 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M5T 2Z5
Phone: (416) 586-5367
Fax: (416) 586-5378
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kimberly Liu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Liu ( CPSO# 80612 )

Business Address:
Centre for Fertility and Reproductive Health
Suite 700
250 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M5T 2Z5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5367

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMBERLY ELLEN LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 May 2004 to 28 May 2004
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2004 to 19 Nov 2004
Elective Trainee - Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 May 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Nov 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006