Liu, Lok-Wan Felix (CPSO#: 31223)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Nov 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
250 Harding Boulevard West
Suite 302
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone: (905) 883-5580
Fax: (905) 883-7824
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 205
330 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Canada
Phone: (905) 764-8808
Fax: (905) 764-9887
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F.L. Liu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 23 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Liu ( CPSO# 31223 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
250 Harding Boulevard
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 883-5580

Business Address:
Suite 205
330 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Phone Number: (905) 764-8808

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOK-WAN FELIX LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1979