Liu, Peter Chian Foong (CPSO#: 52191)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Nov 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
KMH - MRI & Health Care Centres
Suite 101
50 Minthorn Boulevard
Markham ON  L3T 7X8
Phone: (905) 731-7856
Fax: (905) 855-1863
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

KMH Cardiology & Diagnostic Centres
Suite 108
751-B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N4
Canada
Phone: (519) 569-7851
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Liu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Liu ( CPSO# 52191 )

Business Address:
101 - 50 Minthorn Boulevard
Markham ON  L3T 7X8
Phone Number: (905) 731-7856

Business Address:
108 - 751B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N4
Phone Number: (519) 569-7851

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 29 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER CHIAN FOONG LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 1983