Liu, Selina Laura (CPSO#: 84602)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Mar 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Diabetes, Endocrinology
and Metabolism
St.Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor St
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6370
Fax: (519) 646-6109
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Liu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Liu ( CPSO# 84602 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
Division of Endocrinology and Metabolism
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6370

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SELINA LAURA LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2011