Liu, Shuangbo (CPSO#: 100154)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Cardiology
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 18 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHUANGBO LIU shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. LIU is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. LIU shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LIU is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. LIU shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. LIU is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. LIU no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 31 May 2013 to 28 Jun 2013
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017