Liu, Terry Chong-Yo (CPSO#: 63941)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 25 Nov 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Nov 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Nov 1998