Liu, Vivian Wei (CPSO#: 65215)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9th Floor
1240 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5R 2A7
Phone: (416) 969-3250
Fax: (416) 971-7718
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Medical Clinic
265 Yorkland Blvd. Unit 403
North York ON  M2J 5C7
Canada
Phone: (416) 229-2399
Fax: (416) 229-9771
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIVIAN WEI LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993