Liu, Weldon (CPSO#: 69215)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke General Hospital
William Osler Health System
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400 Ext. 33320
Fax: (416) 747-3610
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Weldon Liu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Liu ( CPSO# 69215 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WELDON LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000