Liu-P'ng, Tina Tin-Shun (CPSO#: 58494)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: Liu, Tina Tin-Shun (used until: 28 Jun 1988 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Alberta, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3
2083 Lake Shore Boulevard West
Etobicoke ON  M8V 4G2
Phone: (416) 255-8251
Fax: (416) 252-6875
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tina Liu-P'ng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Liu-P'Ng ( CPSO# 58494 )

Business Address:
3 - 2083 Lakeshore Boulevard West
Etobicoke ON  M8V 4G2
Phone Number: (416) 255-8251

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TINA TIN-SHUN LIU-P'NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU-P'NG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1988