Liutkus, Joanne Frances (CPSO#: 62562)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Dec 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 601
73 Water Street North
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L6
Phone: (519) 624-8977
Fax: (519) 624-2864
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Canada
Phone: (519) 621-2330 Ext. 2345
Fax: 519-740-4948
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joanne F. Liutkus Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Liutkus ( CPSO# 62562 )

Business Address:
Unit 601
73 Water Street North
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L6
Phone Number: (519) 624-8977

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANNE FRANCES LIUTKUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIUTKUS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 1991