Lizon, Marina Josefa (CPSO#: 60500)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Sep 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Sep 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Autonoma De Nuevo Leon, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Adult Psychiatry
333 - 25th Street East
Suite 502
Saskatoon SK  S7K 0L4
Phone: (306) 665-8989
Fax: (306) 244-3501

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARINA JOSEFA LIZON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIZON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1993