Llano Ferro, Miguel Alfonso (CPSO#: 59298)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Oct 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Colegio Mayor De Ntra Sra Del Rosario, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Murray Koffler Urologic
Wellness Centre
6th Floor
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-6367
Fax: (416) 586-4776
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Uptown Health Centre
Unit 8
9325 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0A8
Canada
Phone: (905) 508-8876
Fax: (905) 508-1087
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Mens Health Institute
Suite 935
Box 60
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Canada
Phone: (416) 581-0000
Fax: (416) 581-0096
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Miguel Llano Ferro Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Llano Ferro ( CPSO# 59298 )

Business Address:
Uptown Health Centre
9325 Yonge Street
Unit 8
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0A8
Phone Number: (905) 508-8876

Business Address:
Murray Koffler Urologic Wellness Centre
60 Murray Street
6th Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-6367

Business Address:
Men's Health Institute
935 - 790 Bay Street
Box 60
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 581-0000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Colombia
USA - Indiana
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIGUEL ALFONSO LLANO FERRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LLANO FERRO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 May 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1990