Llewellyn, Marcia Wynne (CPSO#: 28480)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 01 Jan 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Mar 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014