Llewellyn, Patrick Allan (CPSO#: 57178)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Apr 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Apr 2007