Lloyd, Lois Adeen (CPSO#: 12911)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1949

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 27 Nov 1954 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1949
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Dec 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2005