Lloyd, Ronald Martin (CPSO#: 31298)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Liverpool, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Phone: 416-398-0638 Fax: 416-398-5932 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Website: www.rsrs.com
Instructions: For records after 2004 please contact: Canadian Forces Base Petawawa Phone: (613)-687-5511
Date Received: 28 Apr 2014


Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 17 Sep 2009

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1980
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014