Lloyd-Smith, Winifred Ann (CPSO#: 57731)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Apr 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Apr 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5508
Fax: (519) 751-5550
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W.A. Lloyd-Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Lloyd-Smith ( CPSO# 57731 )

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 752-7871

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 08 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WINIFRED ANN LLOYD-SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LLOYD-SMITH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Oct 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 1991