Lo, Ada Ying-Tak (CPSO#: 66627)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto North Medical Arts Centre
Suite 121
7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Phone: (416) 628-7702 Ext. 511
Fax: (416) 628-7708
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ada Y.T. Lo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lo ( CPSO# 66627 )

Business Address:
Toronto North Medical Arts Centre
Suite 121
7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Phone Number: (416) 628-7702

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADA YING-TAK LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995