Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Lo, Adrian King Man (CPSO#: 55537)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 May 1985 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 May 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008