Lo, Alexander John (CPSO#: 84603)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
University Centre
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 3944
Fax: (416) 597-7107
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alexander Lo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lo ( CPSO# 84603 )

Business Address:
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
University Centre
550 University Avenue
Room 10-107
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 04 Aug 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER JOHN LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 04 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2008 to 04 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2009 to 04 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2010 to 04 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2011